NY A06261 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to recharge New York power for eligible small businesses and not-for-profit corporations of an amount not to exceed one hundred fifty megawatts.
Title
Relates to recharge New York power for eligible small businesses and not-for-profit corporations of an amount not to exceed one hundred fifty megawatts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.197 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.853 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5992 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.210 |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S05992 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6261