NY A06261 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Real property owned by an enrolled member of an auxiliary police organization or such enrolled member and spouse shall be exempt from taxation to the extent of ten percent of the assessed value of such property for village, town, part town, special district or county purposes, exclusive of special assessments, provided that the governing body of a village, town or county, after a public hearing, adopts a local law, ordinance or resolution providing therefor.
Title
An act to amend the real property tax law, in relation to establishing a real property tax exemption for enrolled members of auxiliary police organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to real property taxation | |
2009-05-12 | held for consideration in real property taxation | |
2009-02-27 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S6741 (Same As) 2010-02-02 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT