NY A06258 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to local government borrowing practices and mandate relief.
Title
Relates to local government borrowing practices and mandate relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | signed chap.77 |
2015-07-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4954 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.426 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04954 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6258