NY A06255 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits removal from the judicial diversion program of defendants with opioid addictions, on the basis of participation prescribed drug treatment under the care of a physician.
Title
Prohibits removal from the judicial diversion program of defendants with opioid addictions, on the basis of participation prescribed drug treatment under the care of a physician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4239B |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.425 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | print number 6255b |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | print number 6255a |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04239 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6255B