NY A06246 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the West Babylon Church of God of Prophecy Inc., to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for certain assessment rolls.
Title
Authorizes the West Babylon Church of God of Prophecy Inc., to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for certain assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.459 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a6246a |
2019-06-06 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.930 |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1927A |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s1927a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.146 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | print number 6246a |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01927 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459