NY A06241 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates sweet corn as the state vegetable.
Title
Designates sweet corn as the state vegetable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | print number 6241a |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06750 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS