NY A06233 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s5438a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s5438a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes tastings at licensed premises by distillers; authorizes the sale of any liquor manufactured by the licensee; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes tastings at licensed premises by distillers; authorizes the sale of any liquor manufactured by the licensee; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s5438a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.401 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6233a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05438 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.315