NY A06230 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - print number 6230a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - print number 6230a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the persons responsible for reporting cases of suspected child abuse to include employees, volunteers, or agents of any corporate entity having an agreement with a municipality as a tier II facility or any other shelter providing temporary housing to persons under the age of 18.
Title
Relates to expanding the persons responsible for reporting cases of suspected child abuse to include employees, volunteers, or agents of any corporate entity having an agreement with a municipality as a tier II facility or any other shelter providing temporary housing to persons under the age of 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | print number 6230a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08678 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES