NY A06229 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - advanced to third reading cal.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that if financial loss has been made and a registrant or unregistered repair shop fails to comply with an order to pay restitution, the commissioner shall, by order, increase the amount of the penalty assessed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that if financial loss has been made and a registrant or unregistered repair shop fails to comply with an order to pay restitution, the commissioner shall, by order, increase the amount of the penalty assessed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-12Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.408
2024-04-09Assemblyreported
2024-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S03015 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback