NY A06223 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Genesee to make voluntary revenue distribution payments to towns or villages located within the county; provides that revenue distributions provided to villages wholly or partially within a town shall be first applied to part-town activities in the area of the town outside of such village, and any remaining balance shall be applied to town wide activities.
Title
Authorizes the county of Genesee to make voluntary revenue distribution payments to towns or villages located within the county; provides that revenue distributions provided to villages wholly or partially within a town shall be first applied to part-town activities in the area of the town outside of such village, and any remaining balance shall be applied to town wide activities.
Sponsors
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] | Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | print number 6223a |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04717 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT