NY A06223 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - approval memo.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - approval memo.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to real property tax exemptions available to veterans.
Title
Relates to real property tax exemptions available to veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | approval memo.1 |
2015-10-26 | Senate | signed chap.381 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4391A |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.360 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | print number 6223a |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04391 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6223A