NY A06222 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires translations of a patient's rights into the six most common non-English languages of New York State; relates to the posting of information relating to the long-term care ombudsman program.
Title
Requires translations of a patient's rights into the six most common non-English languages of New York State; relates to the posting of information relating to the long-term care ombudsman program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4377 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.326 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04377 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.84