NY A06221 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Nassau county assessor to accept an application from the town of Oyster Bay for a real property tax exemption for property owned by such municipal corporation.
Title
Authorizes the Nassau county assessor to accept an application from the town of Oyster Bay for a real property tax exemption for property owned by such municipal corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4645 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.578 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04645 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.350