NY A06221 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - print number 6221b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - print number 6221b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the water resources planning council to include regional representatives and requires reports from the council.
Title
Expands the water resources planning council to include regional representatives and requires reports from the council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | print number 6221b |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | print number 6221a |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |