NY A06217 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to anti-arson applications; makes the provision of law relating to anti-arson applications applicable to only cities with a population over one million persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to anti-arson applications; makes the provision of law relating to anti-arson applications applicable to only cities with a population over one million persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12Senatesigned chap.289
2017-08-31Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-15SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-15Senate3RD READING CAL.1802
2017-06-15SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6010
2017-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.533
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-02-28Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S06010 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6217

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback