NY A06210 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the power plant tax assessment reserve fund to lessen or prevent increases in the North Shore central school district's real property tax levy and/or tax rate resulting from decreases in revenue or taxes or a significant shift in tax liability due to a tax certiorari settlement or judgment.
Title
Establishes the power plant tax assessment reserve fund to lessen or prevent increases in the North Shore central school district's real property tax levy and/or tax rate resulting from decreases in revenue or taxes or a significant shift in tax liability due to a tax certiorari settlement or judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6210b |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6210a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04243 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - referred to education