NY A06201 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - print number 6201a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - print number 6201a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to taxi and limousine services equipped with wheelchair accessible vehicles.
Title
Relates to taxi and limousine services equipped with wheelchair accessible vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 6201a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07833 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES