NY A06194 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs.
Title
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.238 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.128 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.128 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02530 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
A06194 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
A06194 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE