NY A06188 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to harassment of a rent regulated tenant; establishes the crimes of harassment of a rent regulated tenant in the first and second degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to harassment of a rent regulated tenant; establishes the crimes of harassment of a rent regulated tenant in the first and second degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10Senate3RD READING CAL.214
2019-04-10SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2605
2019-03-26SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.122
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-03-01Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02605 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6188

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback