NY A06178 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reforms the state budget process to provide that upon failure by the legislature to act upon a state budget within seventy-two hours from the beginning of the state fiscal year, a default budget shall take effect.
Title
Reforms the state budget process to provide that upon failure by the legislature to act upon a state budget within seventy-two hours from the beginning of the state fiscal year, a default budget shall take effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |