NY A06176 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalty for the crime of criminally negligent homicide by changing such offense to a class D felony from a class E felony.
Title
Increases the penalty for the crime of criminally negligent homicide by changing such offense to a class D felony from a class E felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00943 (Same As) 2012-02-29 - referred to codes