NY A06175 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state power authority and its employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Title
Requires the New York state power authority and its employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.380 |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.236 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.495 |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03120 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE