NY A06174 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects various laws to ensure that the office for people with developmental disabilities is no longer referred to as the office of mental retardation and developmental disabilities.
Title
Corrects various laws to ensure that the office for people with developmental disabilities is no longer referred to as the office of mental retardation and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.672 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.351 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a6174 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.299 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s4276 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.351 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S04276 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.672