NY A06173 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including outpatient care provided by creative arts therapists in certain insurance policies covering care for other mental health services.
Title
Relates to including outpatient care provided by creative arts therapists in certain insurance policies covering care for other mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.161 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.161 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06362 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE