NY A06165 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - signed chap.627
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - signed chap.627
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the electric vehicle rights act; provides that a homeowners' association may not adopt or enforce any rules or regulations that would effectively prohibit, or impose unreasonable limitations on, the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station.
Title
Enacts the electric vehicle rights act; provides that a homeowners' association may not adopt or enforce any rules or regulations that would effectively prohibit, or impose unreasonable limitations on, the installation or use of an electric vehicle charging station.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Emily Gallagher [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | Assembly | signed chap.627 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1182 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8518A |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.187 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6165a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08518 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6165A