NY A06157 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for financial assistance from industrial development agencies to provide information on the use of material and products manufactured or produced in this state and on the creation of local jobs.
Title
Requires applicants for financial assistance from industrial development agencies to provide information on the use of material and products manufactured or produced in this state and on the creation of local jobs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6157a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.203 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05146 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT