NY A06157 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to developing and implementing programs to prevent workplace violence in public schools.
Title
Relates to developing and implementing programs to prevent workplace violence in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.209 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.622 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6157 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1473 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1720 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.622 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.622 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01720 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.209