NY A06156 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - print number 6156a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - print number 6156a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules, regulations and standards.
Title
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules, regulations and standards.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | print number 6156a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06665 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to economic development