NY A06146 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-14)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.
Title
Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.269 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.363 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6146 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.988 |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4571 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.363 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.363 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04571 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.269