NY A06144 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s4817a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the tax on gaming revenues in region five of zone two and to the tax rates on certain facilities within the Tioga county portion of such region; adds additional vendor fees for a certain track located within Oneida county; extends the effectiveness of such additional vendor fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the tax on gaming revenues in region five of zone two and to the tax rates on certain facilities within the Tioga county portion of such region; adds additional vendor fees for a certain track located within Oneida county; extends the effectiveness of such additional vendor fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted by s4817a
2023-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.767
2023-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.767
2023-06-08Assemblyreported
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-07Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-06-02Assemblyprint number 6144a
2023-06-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S04817 (Same As) 2023-10-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.12

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback