NY A06142 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - substituted by s6149a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization for the county of Monroe to impose certain sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization for the county of Monroe to impose certain sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31Assemblysubstituted by s6149a
2023-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.376
2023-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.376
2023-05-30Assemblyreported
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-01Assemblyprint number 6142a
2023-05-01Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06149 (Same As) 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.251

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback