NY A06137 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6137a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26Assemblyprint number 6137a
2020-02-26Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-02-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S04367 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4367A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback