NY A06137 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 6137a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 6137a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the maximum benefit rate for unemployment insurance.
Title
Relates to increasing the maximum benefit rate for unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assembly | print number 6137a |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00673 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES