NY A06137 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an economic grant program for the Second Avenue Subway construction project area; appropriates funds therefor.
Title
Establishes an economic grant program for the Second Avenue Subway construction project area; appropriates funds therefor.
Sponsors
Asm. Jonathan Bing [D] | Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Asm. Adam Powell [D] | Asm. Robert Reilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-10 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-10 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.427 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.568 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.568 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-22 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-26 | print number 6137a | |
2009-05-26 | amend (t) and recommit to economic development | |
2009-02-26 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S3798-A (Same As) 2010-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE