NY A06135 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - print number 6135a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - print number 6135a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "safe cars safe streets act"; requires the inspection of tinted or shaded windows, airbag systems, and antilock brake systems during the required periodic inspection of motor vehicles.
Title
Enacts the "safe cars safe streets act"; requires the inspection of tinted or shaded windows, airbag systems, and antilock brake systems during the required periodic inspection of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Assembly | print number 6135a |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06862 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to transportation