NY A06133 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 6133a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 6133a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a job development incentive income tax credit available to employers who employ individuals previously receiving unemployment.
Title
Creates a job development incentive income tax credit available to employers who employ individuals previously receiving unemployment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | print number 6133a |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03783 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 3783A