NY A06132 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s5984a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for conditional registration of voters during early voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for conditional registration of voters during early voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s5984a
2023-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.714
2023-06-08Assemblyreported
2023-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-22Assemblyprint number 6132a
2023-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S05984 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - SIGNED CHAP.479

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6132
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06132&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06132
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06132&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06132A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06132&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06132&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06132&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback