NY A06130 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - print number 6130a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - print number 6130a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the de-regulation of rent-stabilized housing accommodations; eliminates rent regulation for any regulated housing accommodation that becomes vacant on or after June 16, 2019; makes exceptions.
Title
Relates to the de-regulation of rent-stabilized housing accommodations; eliminates rent regulation for any regulated housing accommodation that becomes vacant on or after June 16, 2019; makes exceptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R] | Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Asm. Doug Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | Assembly | print number 6130a |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |