NY A06121 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4435b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4435b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of a board of trustees of public, free association and Indian libraries to complete two hours of trustee education annually.
Title
Requires members of a board of trustees of public, free association and Indian libraries to complete two hours of trustee education annually.
Sponsors
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Colin Schmitt [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4435b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.573 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | print number 6121b |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6121a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to libraries and education technology |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S04435 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468