NY A06105 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the GrowNY pilot program, an economic gardening pilot program within the department of economic development to stimulate investment in the state economy by providing technical assistance for expanding businesses in the state.
Title
Establishes the GrowNY pilot program, an economic gardening pilot program within the department of economic development to stimulate investment in the state economy by providing technical assistance for expanding businesses in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in economic development |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | print number 6105a |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S03392 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - referred to economic development