NY A06101 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts the Buchanan Engine Company No. 1, within the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts the Buchanan Engine Company No. 1, within the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-15Assemblysigned chap.398
2023-09-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.1107
2023-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5886
2023-04-26SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2023-04-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-04-26Assemblypassed assembly
2023-04-20Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.149
2023-04-18Assemblyreported
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05886 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6101

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback