NY A06092 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-12)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - print number 6092b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - print number 6092b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the abbreviation of "D.P.T." and title "doctor of physical therapy" may only be used by a person licensed or otherwise authorized by article 136 of the education law to practice physical therapy.
Title
Provides that the abbreviation of "D.P.T." and title "doctor of physical therapy" may only be used by a person licensed or otherwise authorized by article 136 of the education law to practice physical therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | print number 6092b |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | print number 6092a |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04969 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - referred to higher education