NY A06071 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 6071a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S01211 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1211A