NY A06059 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.282
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.282
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the release of personally identifiable student information where parental consent is not provided.
Title
Prohibits the release of personally identifiable student information where parental consent is not provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.282 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.716 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.716 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6059a |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | referred to education |