NY A06058 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Sarah Clark [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Demond Meeks [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]
Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Jonathan Rivera [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]

Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-10Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-04-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-03-08Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05474 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback