NY A06058 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act".
Title
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act".
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | print number 6058b |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | print number 6058a |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07367 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 7367A