NY A06057 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - print number 6057a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the sale of salvaged airbags; allows for the sale of non-deployed recycled airbags in New York, provided that such airbags meet required safety standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the sale of salvaged airbags; allows for the sale of non-deployed recycled airbags in New York, provided that such airbags meet required safety standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-19Assemblyprint number 6057a
2024-03-19Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2023-03-31Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S09496 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback