NY A06052 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - approval memo.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - approval memo.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential health care facilities to update residents, authorized family members, and guardians of residents of the presence of an infection and to have in their pandemic emergency plan a plan or procedure for designating a separate cohort area.
Title
Requires residential health care facilities to update residents, authorized family members, and guardians of residents of the presence of an infection and to have in their pandemic emergency plan a plan or procedure for designating a separate cohort area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Assembly | approval memo.34 |
2022-12-07 | Assembly | signed chap.662 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.984 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1785A |
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.198 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.39 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.39 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01785 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6052
A02002 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - enacting clause stricken
A02002 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - enacting clause stricken