NY A06044 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical changes to provisions providing for certification for service as a retired judge of the court of appeals or a retired justice of the supreme court.
Title
Makes technical changes to provisions providing for certification for service as a retired judge of the court of appeals or a retired justice of the supreme court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4379 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.805 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04379 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - POCKET VETO - VETO.91