NY A06041 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to failure to obtain an alteration permit or certificate of occupancy for a multiple dwelling; makes such crimes a felony.
Title
Relates to failure to obtain an alteration permit or certificate of occupancy for a multiple dwelling; makes such crimes a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-31 | Assembly | print number 6041a |
2015-03-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03239 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to codes